Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luís Gerardo Ponce de León, I.M.C.

Bishop of Manzini

Apostolic Administrator of Ingwavuma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1961 BornBuenos Aires, Argentina
9 Jan 198321.7ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
28 Dec 198524.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
2 Aug 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
24 Nov 200847.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma, South Africa
24 Nov 200847.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
18 Apr 200947.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba
29 Nov 201352.6AppointedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
29 Nov 201352.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ingwavuma, South Africa
26 Jan 201452.7InstalledBishop of Manzini, Swaziland

MicroData Summary for José Luís Gerardo Ponce de León:
Bishop José Luís Gerardo Ponce de León I.M.C. (born ) Bishop of Manzini

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manzini.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,151
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 26 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014