Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Manzini

Dioecesis Manziniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 7 November 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Johannesburg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Swaziland
  • Square Kilometers: 17,364 (6,706 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 19, Sandlane St., Manzini, Swaziland
  • Telephone: 50.56.900
  • Fax: 50.56.762

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Swaziland
19 April 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Swaziland (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Swaziland
15 March 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Swaziland Vicariate Apostolic of Swaziland
Diocese of Bremersdorp
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Swaziland Diocese of Bremersdorp
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Bremersdorp
Archdiocese of Durban
Diocese of Lydenburg
Prefecture Apostolic of Volksrust (erected)
Diocese of Manzini
7 November 1961Name ChangedDiocese of Bremersdorp Diocese of Manzini
12 November 1962Territory LostDiocese of Eshowe
Diocese of Manzini
Prefecture Apostolic of Ingwavuma (erected)
5 June 2007Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Manzini (from Pretoria)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Swaziland
195010,434263,0004.0%1515695306711ap1951
Diocese of Bremersdorp
195921,447320,0006.7%30307149411ap1960
Diocese of Manzini
196931,959395,2648.1%227291,1024611210ap1971
198036,000540,0006.7%4333797247133ap1981
199042,300740,0005.7%632381,11336872ap1991
199950,160980,0005.1%922311,618425815ap2000
200052,640990,0005.3%923321,645375815ap2001
200153,104990,0005.4%919281,896255715ap2002
200253,866990,0005.4%1219311,737265515ap2003
200354,711990,0005.5%1117281,953245715ap2004
200455,130990,0005.6%1115262,120235815ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014