Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Eshowe

Dioecesis Eshovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Durban
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 26,364 (10,183 Square Miles)
  • Description: comprises Zululand proper, (with the exception of the districts of Ingwavuma, Ubombo and Hlabisa), and the four Natal districts of Vryheid, Paulpietersburg, Ngotshe and Babanango.
  • Official Web Site: http://eshowe.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 553, Eshowe 3815, Zululand, South Africa
  • Telephone: (035)474.4151
  • Fax: 474.4644

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Zululand
27 August 1921ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Zululand (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eshowe
11 December 1923ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Zululand Vicariate Apostolic of Eshowe
Diocese of Eshowe
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Eshowe Diocese of Eshowe
12 November 1962Territory LostDiocese of Eshowe
Diocese of Manzini
Prefecture Apostolic of Ingwavuma (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Eshowe
195015,765442,9063.6%132334776310012ap1951
Diocese of Eshowe
197042,091720,0005.8%4454985978220ap1971
198059,1481,028,0005.8%533381,5566120925ap1981
199066,5141,355,0004.9%1424381,7505016629ap1991
199979,7252,000,0004.0%2217392,0443515429ap2000
200079,9502,200,0003.6%2316392,0503713929ap2001
200180,0002,200,0003.6%2118392,0513112529ap2002
200280,0002,200,0003.6%2317402,0003212951ap2003
200380,6002,200,6003.7%2415392,0663012528ap2004
200481,0002,200,6003.7%2516411,9752812528ap2005
200682,4002,305,0003.6%2914431,9162711829ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013