Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurelian (Josef) Bilgeri, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Eshowe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1909BornMemmingen, Germany
16 May 193121.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Mar 193626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jun 194738.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eshowe, South Africa
12 Jun 194738.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
14 Sep 194738.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germanicopolis
11 Jan 195141.6AppointedBishop of Eshowe, South Africa
24 Jul 197364.1DiedBishop of Eshowe, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Aurelian (Josef) Bilgeri:
Bishop Aurelian (Josef) Bilgeri O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Eshowe

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013