Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Isaac Mandlenkhosi Zwane

Deceased

Bishop of Manzini, Swaziland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1932Born
12 Jul 196432.1Ordained PriestPriest of Manzini, Swaziland
24 Jan 197643.7AppointedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
16 May 197644.0Ordained BishopBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
10 Aug 198048.2DiedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Isaac Mandlenkhosi Zwane
Bishop Aloysius Isaac Mandlenkhosi Zwane (born , died ) Bishop of Manzini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMsunduza

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018