Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erwin Hecht, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kimberley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1933BornBurgrieden, Germany
26 Jul 195925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
3 Feb 197238.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kimberley, South Africa
3 Feb 197238.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
11 May 197238.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
1 Jul 197440.7AppointedBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
15 Dec 200976.1RetiredBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
19 Nov 201683.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kimberley, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Erwin Hecht
Bishop Erwin Hecht O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kimberley

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2009
  • d: CB, 21 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Nov 2016