Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pellegrino Bellezze, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Swaziland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1884Born
21 Dec 190723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Mar 192339.1AppointedPrefect of Swaziland
May 1933³49.3ResignedPrefect of Swaziland
18 Aug 196177.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Swaziland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pellegrino Bellezze
Father Pellegrino Bellezze O.S.M. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Swaziland

EventPlace
Death PlaceHospital, São José dos Campos, Brazil

  • a priest for 53.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,927
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast