Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Siegfried Mandla Jwara, C.M.M.

Archbishop of Durban, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1957 Born
1982²24.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
1986²28.9Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
14 Feb 198730.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
30 Apr 201659.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ingwavuma, South Africa
30 Apr 201659.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
25 Jun 201659.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
9 Jun 202164.3AppointedArchbishop of Durban, South Africa
8 Aug 202164.5InstalledArchbishop of Durban, South Africa

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Siegfried Mandla Jwara
Archbishop Siegfried Mandla Jwara C.M.M. (born ) Archbishop of Durban

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Nivard
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Church, Riverview (near Mtubatuba)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Durban.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 4 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 21 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,947
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Jul 2021

Quantcast