Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Klerksdorp

Dioecesis Klerkpolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 27 February 1978
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Johannesburg
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 34,800 (13,441 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kldio.co.za/
  • Mailing Address: 14 Convent Lane, Elandsheuwel, Klerksdorp 2571 o P.O. Box 3071, Freemanville 2573, South Africa
  • Telephone: (018)462-2261
  • Fax: 462-9168

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Transvaal
14 October 1965ErectedDiocese of Johannesburg Prefecture Apostolic of Western Transvaal (erected)
Diocese of Klerksdorp
27 February 1978ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Western Transvaal Diocese of Klerksdorp
5 June 2007Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Klerksdorp (from Pretoria)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Western Transvaal
197039,009492,9737.9%121221,7733760ap1971
Diocese of Klerksdorp
198054,161617,2048.8%117183,0082326ap1981
199066,420827,0008.0%13135,1091202ap1991
199998,2501,500,0006.5%110118,931419541ap2000
200099,2321,500,0006.6%110119,021419541ap2001
2001102,4281,500,0006.8%101010,242419541ap2002
2002101,9291,500,0006.8%210128,494414541ap2003
2003100,9611,500,0006.7%39128,413412841ap2004
2004103,4661,500,0006.9%411156,897313641ap2005
200696,2691,500,0006.4%713204,813428741ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 24 Nov 2014