Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Noé Rodrigues

Bishop of Tzaneen, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1955 Born
4 Jul 198227.3Ordained PriestPriest of Witbank, South Africa
28 Jan 201054.8AppointedBishop of Tzaneen, South Africa
18 Apr 201055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tzaneen, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Joćo Noé Rodrigues
Bishop Joćo Noé Rodrigues (born ) Bishop of Tzaneen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCape Town

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tzaneen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast