Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Naidoo, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1937BornCape Town
25 Jan 195517.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Jun 196123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
1 Jul 197436.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
1 Jul 197436.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mammilla
2 Aug 197436.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
15 Sep 197436.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Flaviae
20 Oct 198447.0AppointedArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
1 Jul 198951.7DiedArchbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Stephen Naidoo:
Archbishop Stephen Naidoo C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cape Town {Kaapstad}

  • a priest for 28.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 5 Mar 2014