Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Poledrini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Lesotho

Titular Bishop of Vazari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1914BornGenova
27 Mar 193722.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 196551.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vazari
27 Oct 196551.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Zambia
5 Dec 196551.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vazari
21 May 196651.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Malawi
20 Sep 197157.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
20 Sep 197157.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to South Africa
18 Sep 197864.2ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
18 Sep 197864.2ResignedApostolic Delegate to South Africa
23 Apr 198065.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Poledrini:
Archbishop Alfredo Poledrini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Lesotho

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013