Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to South Africa

Repubica Africae Australis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 25 June 1994
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: South Africa
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 95200, 0145 Waterkloof (Pretoria), South Africa; 4 Argo Street, 0181 Waterkloof Ridge (Pretoria), South Africa
  • Telephone: (27-12)346.42.35
  • Fax: 346.14.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Southern Africa
7 December 1922EstablishedDelegation to Southern Africa (Cape, Orange, Natal, and Transvaal along with Basutoland and Bechuanaland)
11 March 1967EstablishedDelegation to Southern Africa Nunciature to Lesotho
11 March 1992EstablishedDelegation to Southern Africa Nunciature to Swaziland
Nunciature to South Africa
25 June 1994ElevatedDelegation to Southern Africa Nunciature to South Africa

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Southern Africa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 15, Page 64, and Page 65
  • Nunciature to South Africa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 86, Page 571

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 17 Jun 2024