Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Francis McGeough

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

Titular Archbishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1903BornNew York, NY, USA
20 Dec 193027.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 195753.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Ethiopia
17 Sep 196057.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
17 Sep 196057.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to South Africa
28 Oct 196057.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
8 Jul 196763.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
Mar 1969³65.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
12 Oct 197067.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis McGeough:
Archbishop Joseph Francis McGeough (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Ireland

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013