Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John McCormack

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meath


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1921BornMoyanalty
23 Jun 194625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
29 Jan 196846.8AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
10 Mar 196847.0Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
16 May 199069.1ResignedBishop of Meath, Ireland
21 Sep 199675.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John McCormack:
Bishop John McCormack (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meath

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013