Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Gordon

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1912BornClare Castle, Ireland
7 Mar 193623.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 196249.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
10 Feb 196249.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Thailand
24 Jun 196249.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
19 Aug 196755.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to South Africa
19 Aug 196755.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Lesotho
11 Aug 197159.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to India
11 Jun 197663.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands
Nov 1978³66.3ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Netherlands
30 Jan 198168.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Gordon:
Archbishop John Gordon (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Netherlands

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 86
  • ab/xxth: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013