Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Alangimattathil, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kohima, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1933Born
2 Dec 196431.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jan 197339.5AppointedBishop of Kohima-Imphal, India
14 Oct 197340.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kohima-Imphal, India
11 Jul 199663.0ResignedBishop of Kohima, India
18 Nov 199764.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kohima, India

MicroData Summary for Abraham Alangimattathil
Bishop Abraham Alangimattathil S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kohima

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaika
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Kohima, Diocese of Kohima-Imphal

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,296
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,352
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,407

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast