Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Emmanuel Vayalil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palai (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1906BornPalai
21 Dec 193529.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 195044.5AppointedBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
9 Nov 195044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India
21 Nov 198680.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Palai (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Emmanuel Vayalil:
Bishop Sebastian Emmanuel Vayalil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palai

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013