Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastian Mankuzhikary

Deceased

Bishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1929BornThannirmukom
12 Mar 195526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 Nov 196940.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
15 Nov 196940.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
6 Jan 197040.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa dei Siri
28 Apr 198657.1AppointedBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India
3 Jul 198657.3InstalledBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India
11 Jun 199465.3DiedBishop of Thamarasserry (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Sebastian Mankuzhikary:
Bishop Sebastian Mankuzhikary (born , died ) Bishop of Thamarasserry

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013