Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Elavanal, M.C.B.S.

Bishop of Kalyan (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1950 BornMutholi
22 Dec 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
11 Nov 199646.6AppointedBishop of Kalyan (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Feb 199746.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kalyan (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Elavanal:
Bishop Thomas Elavanal M.C.B.S. (born ) Bishop of Kalyan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalyan (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,923
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013