Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)

Archidioecesis Trichuriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrews Thazhath, Archbishop
  • Raphael Thattil, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jacob Thoomkuzhy, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 May 1995
  • Metropolitan See
  • Syro-Malabar Catholic Church of the Chaldean Tradition
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 2,000 (772 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Archbishop's House, Bishop Palace Road, P.O. Box 706, Thrissur-680005, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0487)2333.325; 2333.542
  • Fax: 2338.204

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
20 May 1887ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Eparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
21 December 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) Eparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
27 June 1974Territory LostEparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) Diocese of Palghat (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
22 June 1978Territory LostEparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) Diocese of Irinjalakuda (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
18 May 1995ElevatedEparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
1950244,9251,119,27521.9%156632191,11863791161ap1951
1970442,185241933341,3231722,767175ap1971
1980326,701153762291,4262022,381164ap1981
1990374,0752,109,73617.7%190802701,3852263,444197ap1991
Archdiocese of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
1999423,5142,018,63521.0%209852941,4402363,965183ap2000
2000424,0102,019,05021.0%2181083261,3002264,005186ap2001
2001446,2742,018,63522.1%2301143441,2972264,295214ap2002
2002448,8492,025,63522.2%2421213631,2362724,295216ap2003
2003456,7592,510,96518.2%2521283801,2012792,705189ap2004
2004463,3062,580,73618.0%2551233781,2252712,764224ap2005
2009499,0002,752,50018.1%2761574331,1523353,442197ap2010
2010470,3242,791,00016.9%2881654531,0383733,459201ap2011
2014471,6113,056,94315.4%3312295608424413,042210ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015