Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Vazhapilly

Deceased

Bishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1878BornPuthenvelikara
22 Dec 190628.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 192142.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
7 Apr 192142.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
6 Jul 192143.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
21 Dec 192345.5AppointedBishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
12 May 194263.9DiedBishop of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Francis Vazhapilly:
Bishop Francis Vazhapilly (born , died ) Bishop of Trichur

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015