Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Chulaparambil

Deceased

Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1877BornKumarakom
22 Dec 190629.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese), India
16 Jul 191436.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese), India
16 Jul 191436.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Busiris
1 Nov 191437.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Busiris
21 Dec 192346.2AppointedBishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese), India
8 Jan 195173.2DiedBishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Alexander Chulaparambil:
Bishop Alexander Chulaparambil (born , died ) Bishop of Kottayam

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 57
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013