Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Franšois Marie Goethals, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Calcutta, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1832Born
31 Oct 185219.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
11 Sep 186229.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Dec 187745.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
15 Jan 187845.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
5 Feb 187845.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
24 Feb 187845.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
25 Nov 188654.0AppointedArchbishop of Calcutta, India
6 Mar 188754.3InstalledArchbishop of Calcutta, India
4 Jul 190168.6DiedArchbishop of Calcutta, India

MicroData Summary for Paul Franšois Marie Goethals
Archbishop Paul Franšois Marie Goethals S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Calcutta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourtrai, Belgium
Ordained BishopSt Martin, Courtrai

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 172, and Page 266
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 305
  • c1+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1878, Number 10
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017