Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pozzi, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krishnagar, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1828Born
14 Jun 185123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
1878¹49.8AppointedPrefect of Central Bengal, India
25 Nov 188658.7AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
13 Feb 188758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India
23 Oct 190577.6DiedBishop of Krishnagar, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pozzi
Bishop Francesco Pozzi P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Krishnagar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCalcutta, Archdiocese of Calcutta

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017