Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Caprotti, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hyderabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1832Born
2 Jun 185523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
28 Feb 188249.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hyderabad, India
28 Feb 188249.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
29 Jun 188250.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
25 Nov 188654.6AppointedBishop of Hyderabad, India
2 Jun 189765.2DiedBishop of Hyderabad, India

MicroData Summary for Pietro Caprotti
Bishop Pietro Caprotti P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Hyderabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarate Brianza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopHyderbad, Vicariate Apostolic of Hyderabad

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71, and Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017