Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Tissot, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vizagapatam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1810BornMegève, France
1836¹25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
1852¹41.3AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam, India
11 Aug 186352.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vizagapatam, India
11 Aug 186352.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
3 Apr 186453.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
25 Nov 188676.2AppointedBishop of Vizagapatam, India
27 Sep 189080.0DiedBishop of Vizagapatam, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Tissot:
Bishop Jean-Marie Tissot M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Vizagapatam

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 384, and Page 594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013