Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Gabriel Léon Louis Meurin, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1825Born
23 Sep 184823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Jun 186741.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
4 Jun 186741.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ascalon
2 Feb 186842.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ascalon
1886¹60.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
15 Sep 188762.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
27 Sep 188762.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Port-Louis, Mauritius
1 Jun 189569.9DiedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Gabriel Léon Louis Meurin (VIAF: 42602600)
Archbishop Johann Gabriel Léon Louis Meurin S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Port-Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlin, Germany
Ordained BishopN.S. de Esperanca, Bombay, Vicariate Apostolic of Bombay, India

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 125, and Page 416
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017