Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Poona

Dioecesis Poonensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Thomas Dabre, Bishop
  • Valerian D’Souza, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bombay
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 49,678 (19,188 Square Miles)
  • Description: consists of the civil districts of Pune, Satara, Solapur, Sangli, Kolhapur, Ratnagiri and Sindhudurg.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.poonadiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 1-B Prince of Wales Drive, Pune-411001, Maharashtra, India
  • Telephone: (020)2636.00.65; 2636.13.18
  • Fax: 2634.35.10

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 September 1886ErectedDiocese of Poona (erected)
19 September 1953Territory LostArchdiocese of Goa e Damăo
Diocese of Poona
Diocese of Belgaum (erected)
15 May 1987Territory LostDiocese of Poona Diocese of Nashik (erected)
5 July 2005Territory LostDiocese of Poona Diocese of Sindhudurg (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195043,83111,000,000.4%232346952457228ap1951
1970114,27227,000,000.4%497712690624851455ap1971
1980144,65024,450,000.6%5518624160066952359ap1981
199080,66915,600,000.5%6312919242072262940ap1991
199993,40729,671,589.3%7913121044473148340ap2000
200094,02829,700,000.3%80199994966348040ap2001
200194,82230,000,000.3%7613921544177153740ap2002
200295,05630,000,000.3%7713821544275345943ap2003
200396,08230,000,000.3%7713621345175754743ap2004
200496,48030,000,000.3%7914222143672857043ap2005
200564,23424,305,883.3%611475856241926bul:5Jul2005
201378,71319,729,686.4%6511417943911,36742830ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 22 May 2015