Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Dabre

Bishop of Poona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1945 BornBhuigaon
31 Oct 197126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
2 Apr 199044.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
2 Apr 199044.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
27 May 199044.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
22 May 199852.6AppointedBishop of Vasai, India
4 Apr 200963.4AppointedBishop of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Dabre:
Bishop Thomas Dabre (born ) Bishop of Poona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Poona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013