Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Longinus Gabriel Pereira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Vada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1911BornMumbai
27 Nov 193827.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 195544.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
5 May 195544.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vada
11 Aug 195544.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vada
13 Dec 198675.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
19 Dec 200493.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Longinus Gabriel Pereira:
Bishop Longinus Gabriel Pereira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 63
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015