Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Bernard Ullathorne, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England

Titular Archbishop of Cabasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1806BornPocklington
24 Sep 183125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 May 184640.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
12 May 184640.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
21 Jun 184640.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
28 Jul 184842.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central District, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185044.4AppointedBishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185044.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185145.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
Jan 1888³81.7RetiredBishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
27 Apr 188882.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cabasa
21 Mar 188982.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Bernard Ullathorne:
Archbishop William Bernard Ullathorne O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 149, and Page 165
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 418
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 213
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013