Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Francis Glancey

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Flaviopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1854Born
22 Dec 187723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
5 Aug 192469.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
5 Aug 192469.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
29 Sep 192469.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flaviopolis
16 Oct 192570.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Francis Glancey (VIAF: 1006545)
Bishop Michael Francis Glancey (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWolverhampton, Staffordshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained PriestSt. Bernard, Seminary, Olton, Solihull, Warwickshire, Diocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceArchbishop's House, 6 Norfolk Road, Edgbaston, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Seminary, Oscott, Sutton Coldfield, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 58
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 98
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast