Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Crompton Ambrose Burton

Deceased

Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1852Born
31 May 189037.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 190249.7AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
1 May 190249.9Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
8 Feb 193178.6DiedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Crompton Ambrose Burton (VIAF: 210216749)
Bishop George Crompton Ambrose Burton (born , died ) Bishop of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHull, East Yorkshire, Diocese of Beverley, England
Ordained PriestSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopTwelve Apostles, Pro-Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Death PlaceSt. Ambrose, Leigh Woods, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)Chapel Crypt, Holy Souls, Cemetery, Arnos Vale, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 22
  • b/bd/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 53
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast