Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Joseph Lawrence McGrath

Deceased

Archbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1882Born
12 Jul 190826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clifton, England, Great Britain
10 Aug 193553.3AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
24 Sep 193553.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
20 Apr 194058.0AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
28 Feb 196178.9DiedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Lawrence McGrath
Archbishop Michael Joseph Lawrence McGrath (born , died ) Archbishop of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilkenny City, County Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Thomas, Priory, Hawkesyard, Rugeley, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Sorrows, Cathedral, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Death PlaceSt Winifred, Hospital, Canton, Cardiff, Glamorgan, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Abbey, Llantarnam, Cwmbran, Torfaen, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 74
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 142
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c1: CL, 30 Apr 2018
  • loc: CL, 19 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast