Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Peter Mark Jabalé, O.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Menevia, Wales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1933 BornAlessandria, Egypt
29 Sep 195320.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jul 195824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Nov 200067.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
7 Dec 200067.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
12 Jun 200167.7SucceededBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
16 Oct 200875.0RetiredBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Peter Mark Jabalé:
Bishop John Peter Mark Jabalé O.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Menevia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Menevia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,864

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013