Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John McIntyre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England

Titular Archbishop of Odessus

Note/Previous Titular See: (Rector/English College)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1855BornBirmingham
22 May 188025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 191257.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
24 Jun 191257.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamus
30 Jul 191257.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamus
24 Aug 191762.6AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
24 Aug 191762.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
16 Jun 192166.4AppointedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
5 Jul 192166.5InstalledArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 192873.8ResignedArchbishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 192873.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Odessus
21 Nov 193580.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Birmingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John McIntyre:
Archbishop John McIntyre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Birmingham

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015