Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amand-Théophile-Joseph Legrand, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dacca

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1853BornLaigle, France
20 Sep 187926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
16 Aug 191663.3AppointedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
5 Nov 191663.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
9 Nov 192976.6RetiredBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
9 Nov 192976.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
10 Apr 193784.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Dacca, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Amand-Théophile-Joseph Legrand:
Bishop Amand-Théophile-Joseph Legrand C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dacca

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 58
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932, Page 374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013