Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred-Arthur Le Pailleur, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chittagong

Titular Bishop of Cyparissia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1886BornLachine, Canada
23 Dec 191125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
18 Jun 192740.8AppointedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
30 Oct 192741.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
8 Mar 195164.5ResignedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
8 Mar 195164.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyparissia
12 Apr 195265.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chittagong, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Alfred-Arthur Le Pailleur:
Bishop Alfred-Arthur Le Pailleur C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chittagong

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015