Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Ferrando, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shillong, India

Titular Archbishop of Troyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1895Born
18 Mar 192327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Jul 193438.7AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
10 Nov 193439.1Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India
26 Nov 193540.1AppointedBishop of Shillong, India
26 Jun 196973.7ResignedBishop of Shillong, India
26 Jun 196973.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Troyna
21 Jun 197882.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Shillong, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Ferrando
Archbishop Stephen Ferrando S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shillong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRossiglione, Italy

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 78
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 4 Oct 2020

Quantcast