Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Whiteside

Deceased

Archbishop of Liverpool, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1857BornLancaster
30 May 188528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
12 Jul 189437.2AppointedBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
15 Aug 189437.3Ordained BishopBishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 191154.5AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 192163.7DiedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Whiteside
Archbishop Thomas Whiteside (born , died ) Archbishop of Liverpool

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 347
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 214
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016