Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop WIlliam Gordon

Deceased

Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1831Born
10 Feb 185927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Beverley, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 188958.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
28 Dec 188958.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
24 Feb 189058.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
16 Jun 189058.7SucceededBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
7 Jun 191179.7DiedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for WIlliam Gordon (VIAF: 148523216)
Bishop WIlliam Gordon (born , died ) Bishop of Leeds

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThirsk, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestBar, Convent, York, City of York, Diocese of Beverley, England
Ordained BishopSt. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Death PlaceSpringfield House, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Buried Place (Original)Killingbeck, Cemetery, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 116, and Page 348
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 101
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 15
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast