Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Barrett

Deceased

Bishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1878Born
19 Jun 190627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 192648.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 192648.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Assus
22 Feb 192748.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assus
7 Jun 192950.6AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
2 Nov 194668.0DiedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Barrett
Bishop John Patrick Barrett (born , died ) Bishop of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestSt. Joseph, Seminary, Upholland, Skelmersdale, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. Chad, Cathedral, Birmingham, Warwickshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England
Death PlaceStoodley Knowfe, Convent, Torquay, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary, Abbey, Buckfast, Buckfastleigh, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 2
  • c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 30
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast