Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernard William Cardinal Griffin

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1899BornBirmingham
1 Nov 192425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
26 May 193839.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
26 May 193839.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Birmingham, England, Great Britain
30 Jun 193839.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appia
18 Dec 194344.8AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 194444.9InstalledArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
18 Feb 194646.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194646.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
19 Aug 195657.4DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bernard William Griffin:
Bernard William Cardinal Griffin (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 50
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 109, and Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015