Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis John Vaughan

Deceased

Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1877Born
5 Jul 190326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Newport, Wales, Great Britain
21 Jun 192649.1AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
8 Sep 192649.3Ordained BishopBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
14 Sep 192649.3InstalledBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
13 Mar 193557.8DiedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Francis John Vaughan (VIAF: 305115042)
Bishop Francis John Vaughan (born , died ) Bishop of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourtfield, Ross-on-Wye, Herefordshire, Diocese of Newport, Wales
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopSt. David, Cathedral, Cardiff, Glamorgan, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Death PlaceBishop's House, Sontley Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales
Buried Place (Original)Wrexham, Cemetery, Ruabon Road, Wrexham, Wrexham, Diocese of Menevia, Wales

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 56
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 199
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast