Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Dunn

Deceased

Bishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1870Born
2 Feb 189322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
3 Jan 191645.4AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
25 Feb 191645.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 193161.1DiedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Dunn
Bishop Thomas Dunn (born , died ) Bishop of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 13
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 84
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018