Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dudley Charles Cary-Elwes

Deceased

Bishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1868Born
30 May 189628.3Ordained PriestPriest of Northampton, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 192153.7AppointedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
15 Dec 192153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain
1 May 193264.2DiedBishop of Northampton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Dudley Charles Cary-Elwes (VIAF: 232145542564496641588)
Bishop Dudley Charles Cary-Elwes (born , died ) Bishop of Northampton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Alpes-Maritimes, Diocese of Nice, France
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopOur Lady Immaculate and St Thomas of Canterbury, Cathedral, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England
Death PlaceHampstead, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Roman Catholic, Cemetery, Great Billing, Northampton, Northamptonshire, Diocese of Northampton, England

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 94
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 59
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast