Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Dobson

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England

Titular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1867BornNew Orleans, LA, USA
23 May 189124.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 192255.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
28 Aug 192255.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia
30 Nov 192255.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Arcadia
6 Jan 194275.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Dobson:
Bishop Robert Dobson (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Liverpool

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014