Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Preston

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Phocaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1856Born
7 Jun 188427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190043.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 190043.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Phocaea
25 Jul 190043.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phocaea
22 Dec 190448.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
9 Feb 190548.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Preston
Bishop Richard Preston (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Leonard's Gate, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Death PlaceSouthfield, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CL, 22 Nov 2011
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 454
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 172
  • bp/r/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast