Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Cornthwaite

Deceased

Bishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1818Born
3 Mar 184425.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Northern District, England, Great Britain
9 Nov 184527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
3 Sep 186143.3AppointedBishop of Beverley, England, Great Britain
10 Nov 186143.5Ordained BishopBishop of Beverley, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 187860.6AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 187860.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 187961.4InstalledBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
18 Dec 187961.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
16 Jun 189072.1DiedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Cornthwaite
Bishop Robert Cornthwaite (born , died ) Bishop of Leeds

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreston, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestVenerable English, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt Mary Moorfields, Pro-Cathedral, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSpringfield House, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady Immaculate, Church, Sicklinghall, Wetherby, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 149, and Page 348
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 71
  • od/c01: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • aadm/midd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 37
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast